PA HB754 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.
Title
In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 754 PN 804, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 754 PN 804, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 754 PN 804, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Act No. 95 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2019-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-09 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-08 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-27 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |