PA HB759 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in emergency management services, providing for emergency response payment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In emergency management services, providing for emergency response payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A02789 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02789 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseRemoved from table
2020-10-26HouseLaid on the table
2020-08-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-08-28HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-20HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-14HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-13HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-18HouseReported as amended
2019-03-08HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback