PA HB769 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for school police officers; and providing for school resource officers, for school security officers and for training.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for school police officers; and providing for school resource officers, for school security officers and for training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-04-25 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-25 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-24 | First consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=769 |