PA HB786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in emergency medical services system, further providing for definitions and for Pennsylvania Trauma Systems Foundation, providing for accreditation of trauma centers, for submission of list, for funding, for notification of trauma center closure, for reporting and for certification and financial report; and making a related repeal.
Title
In emergency medical services system, further providing for definitions and for Pennsylvania Trauma Systems Foundation, providing for accreditation of trauma centers, for submission of list, for funding, for notification of trauma center closure, for reporting and for certification and financial report; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 2242, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 786 PN 2242, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 786 PN 2187, A2240, BOSCOLA AMENDMENT NO. A-2240 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 2107, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 2063, 2019 A1846, MACKENZIE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 2063, 2019 A1846, SUSP RULES, MACKENZIE (Y: 195 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 1983, 2019 A1693, MACKENZIE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 1983, 2019 A1691, MACKENZIE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01470 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 786 PN 2242, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 786 PN 2187, A2240, BOSCOLA AMENDMENT NO. A-2240 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 2107, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 2063, 2019 A1846, MACKENZIE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 2063, 2019 A1846, SUSP RULES, MACKENZIE (Y: 195 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 1983, 2019 A1693, MACKENZIE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 786 PN 1983, 2019 A1691, MACKENZIE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01470 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Act No. 54 |
2019-07-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-27 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-06-26 | House | In the House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (41-9) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (43-7) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2187 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-11 | House | Final passage (199-0) |
2019-06-11 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to HEALTH |