PA HB792 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 792 PN 2260, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 792 PN 2059, 2019 A1938, MALONEY (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01658 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-26SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-1)
2019-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-10HouseReported as amended
2019-03-12HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=792
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0792&pn=0872
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0792&pn=2059
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0792&pn=2260
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=684
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=685
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=577
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=919
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=941
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=601

Bill Comments

feedback