PA HB806 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-23 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-23 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for county-based human services funds; and making related repeals.
Title
Providing for county-based human services funds; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |