PA HB806 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1974 (P.L.973, No.319), known as the Pennsylvania Farmland and Forest Land Assessment Act of 1974, further providing for land devoted to agricultural use, agricultural reserve, and/or forest reserve, for responsibilities of department and for responsibilities of county assessor in establishing use values.
Title
Further providing for land devoted to agricultural use, agricultural reserve, and/or forest reserve, for responsibilities of department and for responsibilities of county assessor in establishing use values.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 2948, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 806 PN 2948, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 1429, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01069 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01069 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 2948, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 806 PN 2948, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Floor: HB 806 PN 1429, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01069 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01069 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-20 | House | Act No. 89 |
2016-07-20 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-07-13 | House | Signed in House |
2016-07-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0) |
2016-07-13 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-07-12 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-07-12 | House | In the House |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-06-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-01 | House | Second consideration |
2015-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |