PA HB808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission, providing for power to set fees; in fiscal affairs, further providing for collection fee for uncollectible checks; in fishing licenses, further providing for nonresident and tourist licenses, for one-day resident fishing license, for license, permit and issuing agent fees and for license and permit packaging options; in special licenses and permits, further providing for net permits, for boat and net licenses for boundary lakes, for permits for protection and management of particular fish, for permits for the use of explosives, for Lake Erie fishing permits and for fishing guide and charter boat permits; in regulated fishing lakes, further providing for licenses and for fees; in dams, bar racks and migration devices, further providing for obstructing migration of fish; in preliminary provisions, further providing for fees; and, in registration and titling of boats, further providing for issuing agents, for fees and for notice for boats and related equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission, providing for power to set fees; in fiscal affairs, further providing for collection fee for uncollectible checks; in fishing licenses, further providing for nonresident and tourist licenses, for one-day resident fishing license, for license, permit and issuing agent fees and for license and permit packaging options; in special licenses and permits, further providing for net permits, for boat and net licenses for boundary lakes, for permits for protection and management of particular fish, for permits for the use of explosives, for Lake Erie fishing permits and for fishing guide and charter boat permits; in regulated fishing lakes, further providing for licenses and for fees; in dams, bar racks and migration devices, further providing for obstructing migration of fish; in preliminary provisions, further providing for fees; and, in registration and titling of boats, further providing for issuing agents, for fees and for notice for boats and related equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 808 PN 901, FP (Y: 151 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateRemoved from table
2019-06-12SenateLaid on the table
2019-04-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-04-30SenateReported as committed
2019-04-22SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2019-04-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (151-39)
2019-04-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-10HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-26HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-26HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-26HouseReported as committed
2019-03-13HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=808
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0808&pn=0901
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=189
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=116

Bill Comments

feedback