PA HB81 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for certification of central service technicians; imposing continuing education requirements on central service technicians; providing for duties of health care facilities and the Department of Health; and regulating the practice of surgical technology and surgical technologists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for certification of central service technicians; imposing continuing education requirements on central service technicians; providing for duties of health care facilities and the Department of Health; and regulating the practice of surgical technology and surgical technologists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 81 PN 4475, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 81 PN 4475, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Floor: HB 81 PN 564, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 81 PN 358, 2019 A56, RAPP (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 81 PN 358, 2019 A93, CUTLER (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00040 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29HouseAct No. 80
2020-10-29HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-10-22HousePresented to the Governor
2020-10-21HouseSigned in Senate
2020-10-21HouseSigned in House
2020-10-21HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2020-10-21HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-10-20HouseReferred to RULES
2020-10-20HouseIn the House
2020-10-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2020-10-20SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-10-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-19SenateSecond consideration
2020-10-06SenateFirst consideration
2020-10-06SenateReported as amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-02-21SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2019-02-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-02-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-05HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-05HouseReported as amended
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=81
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0081&pn=0083
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0081&pn=0358
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0081&pn=0564
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0081&pn=4475
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=02/05/2019&RollCallId=15
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=02/05/2019&RollCallId=16
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=40
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=41
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=52
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/21/2019&RollCallId=43
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=10/06/2020&RollCallId=1220
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=687
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/20/2020&RollCallId=1245
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=2581
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1713

Bill Comments

feedback