PA HB820 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-22)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.911, No.147), known as the Telemarketer Registration Act, further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts and penalties and for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 820 PN 2279, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 820 PN 1811, 2015 A2709, FARRY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 820 PN 1811, 2015 A2709, FARRY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2015-10-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |