PA HB825 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-22 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending Title 22 (Detectives and Private Police) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, amending the heading of Title 22 and 22 Pa.C.S. Ch. 3; codifying and making extensive revisions to The Private Detective Act of 1953; codifying the Lethal Weapons Training Act; further providing for the definition of "privately employed agents"; providing for the continuation of certain licenses; making an appropriation; and making related repeals.
Title
An Act amending Title 22 (Detectives and Private Police) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, amending the heading of Title 22 and 22 Pa.C.S. Ch. 3; codifying and making extensive revisions to The Private Detective Act of 1953; codifying the Lethal Weapons Training Act; further providing for the definition of "privately employed agents"; providing for the continuation of certain licenses; making an appropriation; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-22 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-15 | First consideration | |
2007-10-15 | Reported as amended | |
2007-07-03 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE | |
2007-06-27 | Final passage | |
2007-06-27 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2007-06-20 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-04-23 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-23 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-04-18 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-17 | First consideration | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=825 |