PA HB827 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating certain activity by the Delaware River Basin Commission as the exercise of the power of eminent domain that entitles the owners of the property in question to appropriate and just compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating certain activity by the Delaware River Basin Commission as the exercise of the power of eminent domain that entitles the owners of the property in question to appropriate and just compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 827 PN 928, MOT CONST, ZABEL (Y: 108 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 827 PN 928, 2019 A1222, ULLMAN (Y: 81 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 827 PN 928, 2019 A1227, CIRESI (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseThird consideration
2019-05-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-08HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-06HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-26HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-26HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-26HouseReported as committed
2019-03-14HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=827
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0827&pn=0928
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=191
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=262
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=287
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=288
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=555

Bill Comments

feedback