PA HB83 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Veto No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Veto No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 9, 1999 (P.L.1, No.1), known as the Capital Facilities Debt Enabling Act, in capital facilities, further providing for bonds, issue of bonds and notes, maturity and interest.
Title
In capital facilities, further providing for bonds, issue of bonds and notes, maturity and interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 83 PN 2769, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 83 PN 2769, A10417, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-10417 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 83 PN 2769, A10231, FARNESE AMENDMENT NO. A-10231 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 83 PN 2769, FP (Y: 188 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04758 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 83 PN 2769, A10417, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-10417 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 83 PN 2769, A10231, FARNESE AMENDMENT NO. A-10231 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 83 PN 2769, FP (Y: 188 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04758 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Veto No. 3 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-12-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-2) |
2017-12-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-12-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-06 | House | Second consideration |
2017-12-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-12-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-04 | House | First consideration |
2017-12-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |