PA HB849 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for nondisclosure agreements relating to sexual harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for nondisclosure agreements relating to sexual harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 849 PN 2008, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01575 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as amended
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=849
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0849&pn=0949
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0849&pn=2008
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=601
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=602
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=653
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=393
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=714

Bill Comments

feedback