PA HB854 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 23 (Domestic Relations) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of stalking; in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for definitions; in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for penalties; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In assault, further providing for the offense of stalking; in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for definitions; in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for penalties; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 854 PN 968, FP (Y: 188 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 854 PN 968, 2019 A719, DAWKINS (Y: 57 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-15SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-10)
2019-04-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-10HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-08HouseReported as committed
2019-03-18HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=854
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0854&pn=0968
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=233
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=170
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=183
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/15/2019&RollCallId=272

Bill Comments

feedback