PA HB856 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An act amending Title 67 (Public Welfare) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in medical assistance hearings and appeals, further providing for definitions; in public welfare generally, providing for adoption opportunities and for family finding and kinship care; establishing the Kinship Care Program and the Subsidized Permanent Legal Custodianship Program; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.
Title
An act amending Title 67 (Public Welfare) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in medical assistance hearings and appeals, further providing for definitions; in public welfare generally, providing for adoption opportunities and for family finding and kinship care; establishing the Kinship Care Program and the Subsidized Permanent Legal Custodianship Program; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 856 PN 1333, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 856 PN 1333, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A00689 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 856 PN 1333, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A00689 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 14 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-29 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |