PA HB858 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, further defining "employment."
Title
Further defining "employment."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-25 - House - HB 858 PN 1001, FP (Y: 114 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2013-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (114-85) |
2013-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |