PA HB858 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing certain financial institutions to conduct savings promotion programs; and providing for enforcement by the Department of Banking and Securities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing certain financial institutions to conduct savings promotion programs; and providing for enforcement by the Department of Banking and Securities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 858 PN 972, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2019-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-03HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as committed
2019-03-18HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback