PA HB859 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in 911 emergency communication services, further providing for definitions, for telecommunications management, for counties, for fund, for telephone records, for inventory and for termination of chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In 911 emergency communication services, further providing for definitions, for telecommunications management, for counties, for fund, for telephone records, for inventory and for termination of chapter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 859 PN 973, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-12SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as amended
2019-04-22SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-04-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-04-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-27HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-26HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-20HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-20HouseReported as committed
2019-03-18HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=859
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0859&pn=0973
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0859&pn=2086
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=03/20/2019&RollCallId=151
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=153
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=250
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=269

Bill Comments

feedback