PA HB86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1970 (P.L.128, No.49), entitled "An act granting to the Governor of the Commonwealth the sole authority for regulating the display of the flag of the United States from any public ground or building and from any ground or building of certain other institutions," further providing for the display of the official POW/MIA flag on Commonwealth grounds or buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of March 4, 1970 (P.L.128, No.49), entitled "An act granting to the Governor of the Commonwealth the sole authority for regulating the display of the flag of the United States from any public ground or building and from any ground or building of certain other institutions," further providing for the display of the official POW/MIA flag on Commonwealth grounds or buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 86 PN 88, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 86 PN 88, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenateAct No. 81
2020-10-29SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-10-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-10-21SenateSigned in Senate
2020-10-21SenateSigned in House
2020-10-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-10-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-30SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-30SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-22SenateReported as committed
2019-04-22SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-04-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-04-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-27HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-26HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-20HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-20HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=86
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0086&pn=0088
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/19/2019&RollCallId=142
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=150
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=244
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=977
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=1235
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=693

Bill Comments

feedback