PA HB869 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in liquid fuels and fuels tax, further providing for refunds.
Title
In liquid fuels and fuels tax, further providing for refunds.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. Doyle Heffley [R] | Rep. Joseph Emrick [R] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 869 PN 1855, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 869 PN 1755, 2019 A1408, KOSIEROWSKI (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01192 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended A01192 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 869 PN 1855, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 869 PN 1755, 2019 A1408, KOSIEROWSKI (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01192 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended A01192 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-1) |
2019-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |