PA HB880 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 9, 1999 (P.L.1, No.1), known as the Capital Facilities Debt Enabling Act, in capital facilities, further providing for appropriation for and limitation on redevelopment assistance capital projects.
Title
In capital facilities, further providing for appropriation for and limitation on redevelopment assistance capital projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Lewis [R] | Rep. Michael Turzai [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] |
Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. George Dunbar [R] |
Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Eric Nelson [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Rep. John Lawrence [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 880 PN 991, FP (Y: 104 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (104-92) |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to FINANCE |