PA HB881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 18, 1982 (P.L.549, No.159), entitled "An act providing for the administration of certain Commonwealth farmland within the Department of Agriculture," further providing for agricultural land conservation assistance grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of June 18, 1982 (P.L.549, No.159), entitled "An act providing for the administration of certain Commonwealth farmland within the Department of Agriculture," further providing for agricultural land conservation assistance grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00731 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-04HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-04HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-15HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-15HouseReported as amended
2019-03-19HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback