PA HB882 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in indebtedness and borrowing, further providing for definitions, for classification and authority to issue bonds and notes, for cost of project and for exclusion of other self-liquidating debt to determine net nonelectoral debt or net lease rental debt; providing for preliminary filings with department prior to issuance of certain debt; further providing for ordinance authorizing issuance of bonds or notes or instruments evidencing lease rental debt, for small borrowing for capital purposes, for debt statement, for submission to department, for fees for filing, for certificate of approval of transcript, for effect of failure of timely action by department and for records of department; and providing for duties of participants in transactions relating to incurring debt and issuing bonds and notes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In indebtedness and borrowing, further providing for definitions, for classification and authority to issue bonds and notes, for cost of project and for exclusion of other self-liquidating debt to determine net nonelectoral debt or net lease rental debt; providing for preliminary filings with department prior to issuance of certain debt; further providing for ordinance authorizing issuance of bonds or notes or instruments evidencing lease rental debt, for small borrowing for capital purposes, for debt statement, for submission to department, for fees for filing, for certificate of approval of transcript, for effect of failure of timely action by department and for records of department; and providing for duties of participants in transactions relating to incurring debt and issuing bonds and notes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00784 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00737 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00751 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-17HouseReported as amended
2019-03-19HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=882
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0882&pn=0993
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0882&pn=1495
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=339
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=338
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=341
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=340

Bill Comments

feedback