PA HB885 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 20, 1967 (P.L.869, No.385), known as the Public Works Contractors' Bond Law of 1967, further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00641 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-17HouseReported as amended
2019-03-25HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback