PA HB908 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 19, 1968 (1967 P.L.992, No.442), entitled "An act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the local government units thereof to preserve, acquire or hold land for open space uses,"further providing for local taxing options.
Title
Amending the act of January 19, 1968 (1967 P.L.992, No.442), entitled "An act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the local government units thereof to preserve, acquire or hold land for open space uses,"further providing for local taxing options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 1029, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 908 PN 1029, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-14 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |