PA HB913 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, further providing for health insurance coverage for certain children of insured parents and providing for coverage for General Assembly.
Title
In casualty insurance, further providing for health insurance coverage for certain children of insured parents and providing for coverage for General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05220 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented |
2020-04-27 | House | Re-referred to HEALTH |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as amended with request to re-refer to Health |
2020-01-14 | House | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |