PA HB915 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-8)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for power of Governor during emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for power of Governor during emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 915 PN 1487, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 915 PN 1487, FP (Y: 136 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00771 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18SenateBill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
2019-07-02SenateVeto No. 2
2019-07-02SenateVetoed by the Governor
2019-06-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-26SenateSigned in House
2019-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (32-18)
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as committed
2019-05-17SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-07SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (136-61)
2019-05-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-06HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-01HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-17HouseReported as amended
2019-03-20HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=915
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0915&pn=1036
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0915&pn=1487
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=326
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=04/17/2019&RollCallId=328
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=277
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/07/2019&RollCallId=458
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=212

Bill Comments

feedback