PA HB918 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of May 20, 1857 (P.L.617, No.658), entitled "An act making an Appropriation from the State Treasury, in aid of the Farmers' High School."
Title
Repealing the act of May 20, 1857 (P.L.617, No.658), entitled "An act making an Appropriation from the State Treasury, in aid of the Farmers' High School."
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Schmitt [R] | Rep. Russ Diamond [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] |
Rep. James Rigby [R] | Rep. Rich Irvin [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Kurt Masser [R] |
Rep. Mark Gillen [R] | Rep. Martin Causer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 918 PN 2778, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A02674 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A02674 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |