PA HB921 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for definitions and further providing for budget implementation data, for electronic access of information and for lapsing of funds.
Title
In Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for definitions and further providing for budget implementation data, for electronic access of information and for lapsing of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 921 PN 1442, FP (Y: 108 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 921 PN 1442, FP (Y: 108 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (108-90) |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |