PA HB922 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly and for transmission of budget information to the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly and for transmission of budget information to the General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 922 PN 1357, FP (Y: 109 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (109-89)
2019-06-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-13HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-07HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-07HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-07HouseReported as committed
2019-04-10HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback