PA HB945 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for use of pharmacy benefits manager by medical assistance managed care organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, providing for use of pharmacy benefits manager by medical assistance managed care organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03971 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03971 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03852 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-04HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-19HouseReported as amended
2019-06-18HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=945
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0945&pn=2167
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0945&pn=2915
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1398

Bill Comments

feedback