PA HB963 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for courts to be open and suits against the Commonwealth.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for courts to be open and suits against the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 963 PN 1130, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 963 PN 1130, FP (Y: 177 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 963 PN 1130, FP (Y: 177 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 2 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Filed in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-6) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (177-15) |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-09 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-08 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |