PA HB97 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-12)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-12)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, further providing for the offense of sale of tobacco and for the offense of use of tobacco in schools; and, in preemptions relating to municipalities, further providing for tobacco.
Title
In minors, further providing for the offense of sale of tobacco and for the offense of use of tobacco in schools; and, in preemptions relating to municipalities, further providing for tobacco.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 97 PN 2890, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 97 PN 2890, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 97 PN 99, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 97 PN 2890, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 97 PN 2890, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 97 PN 99, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | House | Act No. 93 |
2019-11-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (185-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-11-21 | House | In the House |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-03-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-03-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |