PA HB970 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in administrative organization, repealing provisions relating to employees with access to Federal tax information and providing for criminal history background checks of employees and contractors with access to Federal tax information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In administrative organization, repealing provisions relating to employees with access to Federal tax information and providing for criminal history background checks of employees and contractors with access to Federal tax information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-16HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-08HouseReported as committed
2019-03-26HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback