PA HB976 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-30 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-30 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 10, 1968 (P.L.1158, No.365), entitled "An act creating and establishing the Legislative Data Processing Committee: providing for its membership; prescribing its powers, functions and duties; and making an appropriation," directing the committee to provide limited public access to statutes in computer information systems.
Title
An Act amending the act of December 10, 1968 (P.L.1158, No.365), entitled "An act creating and establishing the Legislative Data Processing Committee: providing for its membership; prescribing its powers, functions and duties; and making an appropriation," directing the committee to provide limited public access to statutes in computer information systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-30 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2007-06-27 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-18 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-18 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-18 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-12 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-12 | First consideration | |
2007-06-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-29 | Referred to RULES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=976 |