PA HB976 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing guidelines and procedures governing certain investigations of correctional officers by the Department of Corrections; authorizing certain civil suits by correctional officers; and providing for impact of collective bargaining agreements and for summary suspensions.
Title
Establishing guidelines and procedures governing certain investigations of correctional officers by the Department of Corrections; authorizing certain civil suits by correctional officers; and providing for impact of collective bargaining agreements and for summary suspensions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2014-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-01-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-01-28 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-12 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-16 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |