PA HB98 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 24, 1976 (P.L.1163, No.259), referred to as the Generic Equivalent Drug Law, providing for epilepsy prescription products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act amending the act of November 24, 1976 (P.L.1163, No.259), referred to as the Generic Equivalent Drug Law, providing for epilepsy prescription products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-09-15 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2008-09-15 Removed from table
2008-09-15 Laid on the table
2008-09-15 Re-reported as committed
2008-06-17 Re-committed to RULES
2008-06-17 First consideration
2008-06-17 Reported as committed
2007-01-30 Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback