PA HB98 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for special registration plates generally and for personal registration plates; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for special registration plates generally and for personal registration plates; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-12-13 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-16 - House - HB 98 PN 2573, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-07SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-12-13SenateFirst consideration
2011-12-13SenateReported as amended
2011-11-22SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2011-11-16SenateIn the Senate
2011-11-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2011-11-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2011-11-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-11-15HouseSecond consideration
2011-11-14HouseRemoved from table
2011-10-18HouseLaid on the table
2011-10-18HouseFirst consideration
2011-10-18HouseReported as amended
2011-01-19HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=98
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0098&pn=0052
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0098&pn=2573
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0098&pn=2892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=896
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=12/13/2011&rNbr=729

Bill Comments

feedback