PA HB985 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for auditor qualifications for the Department of the Auditor General, for new department employees, for current department employees, for employee certification, for forensic audits, for fraud audits and for committee standards.
Title
Providing for auditor qualifications for the Department of the Auditor General, for new department employees, for current department employees, for employee certification, for forensic audits, for fraud audits and for committee standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Rep. Matthew Gabler [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] |
Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Craig Staats [R] | Rep. Keith Greiner [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 985 PN 2192, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 985 PN 1117, 2019 A957, RYAN (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 985 PN 2192, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 985 PN 1117, 2019 A957, RYAN (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |