PA HB991 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board and for specific subjects on which board may adopt regulations; in Pennsylvania Liquor Stores, further providing for sales by Pennsylvania Liquor Stores; and providing for retail stores.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board and for specific subjects on which board may adopt regulations; in Pennsylvania Liquor Stores, further providing for sales by Pennsylvania Liquor Stores; and providing for retail stores.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Harris [R] | Rep. Rich Irvin [R] | Rep. Keith Greiner [R] | Rep. Jason Ortitay [R] |
Rep. David Reed [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Brian Ellis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 991 PN 1234, FP (Y: 107 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00614 (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00624 (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 991 PN 1234, FP (Y: 107 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00614 (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00624 (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (107-83) |
2017-04-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-03 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |