PA HB991 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 8, 1978 (P.L.752, No.140), known as the Public Employee Pension Forfeiture Act, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 991 PN 1122, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 991 PN 1122, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |