PA HB994 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, further providing for dental examinations and dental hygiene services.
Title
In school health services, further providing for dental examinations and dental hygiene services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |