PA HB995 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for regulatory review and for regulatory reduction pilot program; and making an editorial change.
Title
Providing for regulatory review and for regulatory reduction pilot program; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04709 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04900 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04900 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |