PA HR107 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania to require pro bono legal service as a condition of admission to the Pennsylvania Bar.
Title
Urging the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania to require pro bono legal service as a condition of admission to the Pennsylvania Bar.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-11 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-16 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-17 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |