PA HR137 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-12)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on March 19 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to make significant reforms to the Alternative Minimum Tax.
Title
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to make significant reforms to the Alternative Minimum Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-11 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-15 | Removed from table | |
2007-11-15 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-04 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=137 |