PA HR17 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to review the Commonwealth's program of providing grants for environmental protection and improvement projects under the Growing Greener Program and the Community Conservation Partnerships Program.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to review the Commonwealth's program of providing grants for environmental protection and improvement projects under the Growing Greener Program and the Community Conservation Partnerships Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-25 - House - HR 17 PN 15 (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Adopted | |
2009-06-10 | Removed from table | |
2009-06-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-29 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |