PA HR17 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Adopted (160-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Adopted (160-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing April 30, 2013, as "National Fast Day" in honor of the 150th anniversary of President Abraham Lincoln's Proclamation Appointing a National Fast Day.
Title
Recognizing April 30, 2013, as "National Fast Day" in honor of the 150th anniversary of President Abraham Lincoln's Proclamation Appointing a National Fast Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - HR 17 PN 74 (Y: 160 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Adopted (160-35) |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2013-01-14 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |