PA HR248 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to ratify the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement on Trade.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to ratify the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement on Trade.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HR 248 PN 1853 (Y: 108 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HR 248 PN 1853, MOT POSTPONE, DERMODY (Y: 86 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01233 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-20HouseAdopted (108-84)
2019-05-15HouseReported as amended
2019-04-25HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=248
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0248&pn=1503
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0248&pn=1853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=576
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=577
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=514
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=515

Bill Comments

feedback