PA HR274 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-27)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Adopted (195-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution designating April 28 through May 5, 2019, as "Days of Remembrance of the Victims of the Holocaust" and recognizing May 2, 2019, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating April 28 through May 5, 2019, as "Days of Remembrance of the Victims of the Holocaust" and recognizing May 2, 2019, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors

Rep. Dan Frankel [D]Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D]Rep. Patrick Harkins [D]Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]
Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Maria Donatucci [D]Rep. Frank Dermody [D]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]
Rep. Joanna McClinton [D]Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D]Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Tina Davis [D]
Rep. Adam Ravenstahl [D]Rep. Stephen Samuelson [D]Rep. Curtis Sonney [R]Rep. Melissa Shusterman [D]
Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D]Rep. Greg Rothman [R]
Rep. Michael Zabel [D]Rep. Ben Sanchez [D]Rep. Gene DiGirolamo [R]Rep. Christopher Harris [R]
Rep. Dan Williams [D]Rep. Joseph Hohenstein [D]Rep. Stephen McCarter [D]Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]
Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Wendy Ullman [D]
Rep. Robert Merski [D]Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]
Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Thomas Mehaffie [R]Rep. Frank Burns [D]Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]
Rep. Jennifer O'Mara [D]Rep. Jared Solomon [D]Rep. James Marshall [R]Rep. Kristine Howard [D]
Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Daniel Miller [D]Rep. Movita Johnson-Harrell [D]
Rep. Vanessa Brown [D]Rep. Brandon Markosek [D]Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D]Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D]
Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]
Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]Rep. Robert Freeman [D]Rep. Ed Neilson [D]
Rep. Neal Goodman [D]Rep. Marcia Hahn [R]Rep. Michael Sturla [D]Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]
Rep. Carolyn Comitta [D]Rep. Austin Davis [D]Rep. Todd Stephens [R]Rep. Timothy Briggs [D]
Rep. Karen Boback [R]Rep. Mary Isaacson [D]Rep. Mike Carroll [D]Rep. Steven Malagari [D]
Rep. Christopher Rabb [D]Rep. Malcolm Kenyatta [D]Rep. Kevin Boyle [D]Rep. Mark Rozzi [D]
Rep. Rosita Youngblood [D]Rep. Daniel Deasy [D]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Seth Grove [R]
Rep. Perry Warren [D]Rep. Meghan Schroeder [R]Rep. James Roebuck [D]Rep. Wendi Thomas [R]
Rep. Jason Dawkins [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseAdopted (195-0)
2019-04-29HouseINTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback